Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/12/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/12/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/23/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/23/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/26/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/13/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/13/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/22/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/23/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/05/2012