Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/15/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/15/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/24/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/13/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/21/2011