There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Do Not Track Kids Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Children's Online Privacy Protection Act of 1998 to extend, enhance, and revise the provisions relating to collection, use, and disclosure of personal information of children and to establish certain other protections for personal information of children and minors.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/13/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/23/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/13/2011Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/31/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/18/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/02/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/08/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/08/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/08/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/20/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/23/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/27/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/03/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/08/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/28/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/07/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/22/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/26/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/27/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/28/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/13/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/13/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade05/23/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1895.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1895. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/13/2011)

Do Not Track Kids Act of 2011 - Amends the Children's Online Privacy Protection Act of 1998 to: (1) revise the definition of "operator" to include online and mobile applications (currently, only Internet websites and online services); (2) revise the definition of "disclosure" as the release of personal information (currently, the release of personal information collected from a child in identifiable form); and (3) apply the prohibitions against collecting personal information from children to online applications and mobile applications directed to children.

Prohibits an operator of a website, online service, online application, or mobile application directed to children or minors, or an operator having actual knowledge that it is collecting information from children or minors, from: (1) using, disclosing to third parties, or compiling personal information collected from children or minors for targeted marketing purposes; and (2) collecting geolocation information in a manner that violates the regulations prescribed under this Act. Defines a "minor" as an individual over the age of 12 and under the age of 18.

Prohibits an operator of a website, online service, or such applications directed to minors from collecting personal information from minors unless such operator has adopted and implemented a Digital Marketing Bill of Rights for Teens that: (1) is consistent with the Fair Information Practices Principles established by this Act; and (2) balances the ability of minors to participate in the digital media culture with the governmental and industry obligation to ensure that such operators do not subject minors to unfair and deceptive surveillance, data collection, or behavioral profiling.

Preempts state or local laws that impose liability for actions by operators that are inconsistent with the treatment of those actions under this Act.

Requires the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) to promulgate regulations that require operators to implement mechanisms that permit users to erase content that is publicly available through their websites, services, or applications and that contains or displays personal information of children or minors.

Sets forth enforcement provisions.