Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/31/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/18/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/02/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/08/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/08/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/08/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/20/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/23/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/27/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/03/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/08/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/28/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/07/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/22/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/26/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/27/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/28/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/13/2012