Refine your search

Showing 10 of 10 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
08/10/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-158.
08/10/2012 Signed by President.
08/03/2012 Presented to President.
08/01/2012 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S5858-5863)
08/01/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment pursuant to H.Res. 750.(consideration: CR H5552-5578, H5597-5598)
08/01/2012 Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment pursuant to H.Res. 750.(consideration: CR H5552-5578, H5597-5598)
05/21/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(text as passed Senate: CR 5/24/2012 S3641-3651)
05/21/2012 Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/14/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 11 (Roll no. 927).(text: CR 12/13/2011 H8834-8846)
05/13/2011 Introduced in House