There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Public Option Deficit Reduction Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to establish a public health insurance option.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/05/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/01/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/05/2011Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/19/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/19/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/19/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/19/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/18/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/18/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/18/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/11/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/10/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/29/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/04/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/11/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/15/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/06/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/28/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/28/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/13/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/05/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/01/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.191. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/05/2011)

Public Option Deficit Reduction Act - Amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to offer through Exchanges a health benefits plan (public health insurance option) that ensures choice, competition, and stability of affordable, high-quality coverage throughout the United States. Declares that the Secretary's primary responsibility is to create a low-cost plan without compromising quality or access to care.

Sets forth provisions related to the establishment and governance of the public health insurance option, including that such plan: (1) may be made available only through Exchanges; (2) must comply with requirements applicable to other health benefits plans offered through such Exchanges, including requirements related to benefits, benefit levels, provider networks, notices, consumer protections, and cost sharing; and (3) must offer bronze, silver, and gold plan levels.

Requires the Secretary to: (1) establish an office of the ombudsman for the public health insurance option; (2) collect such data as may be required to establish premiums and payment rates; (3) establish geographically adjusted premiums at a level sufficient to fully finance the costs of the health benefits provided and administrative costs related to the operation of the plan; and (4) establish payment rates and provide for greater payment rates for the first three years.

Requires repayment of start-up costs for the public health insurance option.

Authorizes the Secretary to utilize innovative payment mechanisms and policies to determine payments for items and services under the public health insurance option.