Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/19/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/19/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/19/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/19/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/18/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/18/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/18/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/11/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/10/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/29/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/04/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/11/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/15/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/06/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/28/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/28/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/13/2012