Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/13/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/13/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/13/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/13/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/16/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/16/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/16/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/08/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/08/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/08/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/08/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/08/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/08/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/08/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/22/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/22/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/22/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/14/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/23/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/31/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/31/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/31/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/31/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/31/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/31/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/07/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/12/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/15/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/15/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/18/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/10/2012