Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/23/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/23/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/26/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/26/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/26/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/26/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/31/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/13/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/13/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/21/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/21/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/21/2011