Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/23/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/24/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/24/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/24/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 05/25/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/25/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/26/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/26/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/26/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/26/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/26/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/31/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/31/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/31/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/31/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/31/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/01/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/01/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/01/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/02/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/02/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/14/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/14/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/14/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/22/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/11/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/14/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/19/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/14/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/05/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/16/2011