Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/24/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/01/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/03/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/05/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 08/19/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 08/23/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/20/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/25/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/17/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/30/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/14/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/29/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/19/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/13/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/14/2012