Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/24/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/13/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/14/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/28/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/02/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/24/2012