Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/24/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/26/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/18/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/18/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/18/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/26/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/26/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/06/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/01/2012