Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/20/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/24/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/17/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/16/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 01/31/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/28/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/06/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/26/2012
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/18/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/15/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/17/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/07/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/19/2012