Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/02/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/02/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/21/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/23/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/20/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 10/12/2011