Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 05/24/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/01/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/01/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/01/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/01/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/01/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/01/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/01/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 06/01/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/01/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/07/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/14/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/14/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/24/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/19/2011