Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/25/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/14/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/14/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/14/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/14/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/23/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/23/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/23/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/23/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/23/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/06/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 11/18/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/15/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/23/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/23/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/17/2012