There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Dog Training Therapy Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a pilot program on dog training therapy.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/06/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/25/2011Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
02/18/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/06/2011Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (98)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/06/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/06/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/06/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/18/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/18/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/18/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/18/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/18/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 01/18/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/18/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 01/18/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/24/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/24/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/24/2011
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/25/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/25/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/25/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/25/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/26/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/09/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/11/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/11/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/14/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/16/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/18/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/01/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/03/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/08/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/08/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/08/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/14/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/30/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/08/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/11/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/11/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/12/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/02/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/03/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/12/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/23/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/31/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/01/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/12/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/13/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/13/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/22/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/26/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 08/01/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 08/01/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 08/01/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/07/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/07/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/12/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/22/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/06/2011 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/18/2011 Referred to
07/25/2011 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.198.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.198. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/06/2011)

Veterans Dog Training Therapy Act - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a pilot program for assessing the effectiveness of addressing post-deployment mental health and post-traumatic stress disorder symptoms through a therapeutic medium of service dog training and handling for veterans with disabilities. Requires such program to be carried out at Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) medical centers that can provide training areas for such purposes.