Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/06/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/06/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/06/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/18/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/18/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/18/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/18/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/18/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 01/18/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/18/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 01/18/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/24/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/24/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/24/2011
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/25/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/25/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/25/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/25/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/26/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/09/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/11/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/11/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/14/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/16/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/18/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/01/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/03/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/08/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/08/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/08/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/14/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/30/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/08/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/11/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/11/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/12/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/02/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/03/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/12/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/23/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/31/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/01/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/12/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/13/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/13/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/22/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/26/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 08/01/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 08/01/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 08/01/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/07/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/07/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/12/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/22/2012