Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 05/25/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 05/25/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/25/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/25/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/31/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/01/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/03/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 06/14/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/16/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/22/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 06/22/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/07/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/07/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/07/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/11/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/15/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/08/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/13/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/13/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/20/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/20/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/20/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/15/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/24/2012