Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/11/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/11/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/11/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/11/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/11/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/11/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/12/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/12/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/12/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/12/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/12/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/12/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/15/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/19/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/25/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/25/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/30/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/30/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/02/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/16/2011