Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/28/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/21/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/21/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/21/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/19/2012