Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/14/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/28/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/28/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/13/2012