Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/01/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/01/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/24/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/08/2011