Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/25/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/21/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/18/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/18/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/12/2012