Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/24/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/06/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 08/01/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/07/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/13/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/31/2012