Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/27/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/27/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/27/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/27/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/27/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/27/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/15/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/15/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/15/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/21/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 06/24/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/24/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/08/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/08/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/22/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/20/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/20/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/20/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/20/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 10/04/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/04/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 11/15/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 11/15/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/15/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 04/17/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/18/2012