Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 05/25/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/01/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/22/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 10/04/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/01/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/28/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/05/2012