Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 01/05/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/06/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 01/06/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/06/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 01/06/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 01/06/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/06/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/06/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/06/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/06/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/06/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/06/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/06/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/06/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/06/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/06/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/06/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/06/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 01/06/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 01/06/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 01/11/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/11/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 01/11/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/11/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/11/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 01/11/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/18/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/18/2011