Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/02/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/24/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/07/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/01/2012