There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Combating Autism Reauthorization Act of 2011

Short Titles as Introduced

Combating Autism Reauthorization Act of 2011

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Combating Autism Reauthorization Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Combating Autism Act of 2006.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
09/30/2011Became Public Law No: 112-32. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2011Signed by President.
09/29/2011Presented to President.
09/26/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S6004)
09/20/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6249-6250)
05/26/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
09/30/2011Became Public Law No: 112-32. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2011Signed by President.
09/29/2011HousePresented to President.
09/27/2011SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/26/2011SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6004)
09/21/2011SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 174.
09/20/2011-4:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/20/2011-4:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6249-6250)
09/20/2011-3:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2005.
09/20/2011-3:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6249-6254)
09/20/2011-3:54pmHouseMr. Pitts moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/03/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/26/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/26/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (100)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/14/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/14/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/14/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/14/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/22/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/22/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/22/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/22/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/22/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/24/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/24/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/24/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/06/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/06/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/06/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/20/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/20/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/20/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/29/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/01/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/26/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/26/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 08/26/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/26/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/26/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/26/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/07/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/07/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/12/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/15/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/19/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/19/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/19/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/19/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/19/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/19/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/19/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/19/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/19/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/20/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/20/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/20/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/20/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/20/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/26/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/03/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2005. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-32 (09/30/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Combating Autism Reauthorization Act of 2011 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to extend and reauthorize through FY2014: (1) the surveillance and research program for autism spectrum disorder and other developmental disabilities; (2) the education, early detection, and intervention program for autism spectrum disorder and other developmental disabilities; and (3) the Interagency Autism Coordinating Committee.