Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/31/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/13/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/06/2011