Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/24/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/24/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/24/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/24/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/14/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 08/02/2012