Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/03/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/03/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/03/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 06/03/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 07/08/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/19/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 07/19/2011