Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/27/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/08/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/29/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/01/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/01/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/01/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/01/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/01/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/01/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/01/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/01/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2012