Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/14/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/13/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/18/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/18/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/18/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/28/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/01/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/19/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/30/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/30/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/22/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/23/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/06/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/06/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/14/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/26/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/26/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/15/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/15/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/18/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 11/30/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 11/30/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/30/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/30/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/30/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/30/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/30/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/30/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/30/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/30/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/30/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/30/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/30/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/30/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/30/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/30/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/30/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/30/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/01/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/01/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/07/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/16/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/23/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/23/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/31/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/15/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/28/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/06/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/06/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/06/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/25/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/25/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/25/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/25/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/31/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/31/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/31/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/31/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/12/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/13/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/13/2012