Refine your search

9 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
09/30/2011 Became Public Law No: 112-33.
09/30/2011 Signed by President.
09/29/2011 Presented to President.
09/29/2011 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H6463-6465)
09/26/2011 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.(text: CR 10/3/2011 S6055-6056)
09/07/2011 Committee on Appropriations. Reported by Senator Landrieu with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 112-74.
06/02/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 188 (Roll no. 409).
05/26/2011 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 112-91, by Mr. Aderholt.
05/26/2011 Introduced in House