Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/27/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/27/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 05/27/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/27/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/15/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/21/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/22/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/24/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/06/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/07/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/08/2011