Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/03/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/03/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/03/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/24/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/13/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/09/2012