There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Preservation of Access to Osteoporosis Testing for Medicare Beneficiaries Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to improve access to, and utilization of, bone mass measurement benefits under the Medicare part B program by extending the minimum payment amount for bone mass measurement under such program through 2013.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/26/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
06/06/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/03/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/26/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/26/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/26/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/22/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/22/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/22/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/22/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/22/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/08/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/08/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 07/22/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/20/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/20/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/22/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 10/04/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/06/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/12/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/27/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/27/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/27/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/20/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/24/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/16/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/05/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/22/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 04/16/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/08/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/11/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 09/21/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/26/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/03/2011 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/26/2011 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/06/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2020. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/26/2011)

Preservation of Access to Osteoporosis Testing for Medicare Beneficiaries Act of 2011 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to extend through 2013 the minimum payment amount for dual-energy x-ray absorptiometry (DXA) services for bone mass measurement.