Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/22/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/22/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/22/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/22/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/22/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/08/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/08/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 07/22/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/20/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/20/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/22/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 10/04/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/06/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/12/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/27/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/27/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/27/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/20/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/24/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/16/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/05/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/22/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 04/16/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/08/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/11/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/21/2012