Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/31/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/06/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/18/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/01/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/17/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/18/2012