Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/03/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/07/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/07/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/25/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 08/26/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/26/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/14/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 12/06/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/14/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/01/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/29/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/19/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/10/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/10/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/10/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/10/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/08/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/08/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/14/2012