Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 07/07/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/08/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/18/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/18/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/29/2011