Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/01/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/13/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/16/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/23/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/22/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/26/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/09/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/09/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/15/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/20/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/20/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/20/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/20/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/14/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/01/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/04/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/04/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/15/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/15/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/17/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/15/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/07/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/07/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/15/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/21/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/29/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/29/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/09/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 07/12/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/19/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/26/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/26/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/26/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/31/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/14/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/14/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/14/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/14/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/20/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/20/2012