Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/08/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/03/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 11/03/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 11/04/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/04/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/10/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/10/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 11/10/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/14/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/30/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/06/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/16/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/20/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/20/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/22/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 04/17/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/18/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/16/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 07/11/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/17/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/02/2012