Limit your search

1-15 of 15
  1. S.Amdt.578   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] (Submitted 07/20/2011)
  2. S.Amdt.577   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 07/20/2011) (Proposed 07/20/2011)
    Latest Action: 07/20/11 Amendment SA 577 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4703)
  3. S.Amdt.574 to S.Amdt.556   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 07/20/2011)
  4. S.Amdt.572   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] (Submitted 07/20/2011)
  5. S.Amdt.571   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 07/20/2011)
  6. S.Amdt.570   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To provide for the closure of Umatilla Army Chemical Depot, Oregon.
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 07/19/2011) (Proposed 07/19/2011)
    Latest Action: 07/20/11 Amendment SA 570 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  7. S.Amdt.569   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 07/19/2011)
  8. S.Amdt.558   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] (Submitted 07/14/2011)
  9. S.Amdt.557   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] (Submitted 07/14/2011)
  10. S.Amdt.556   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] (Submitted 07/14/2011) (Proposed 07/14/2011)
    Latest Action: 07/20/11 Amendment SA 556 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  11. S.Amdt.555   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 07/14/2011)
  12. S.Amdt.552   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 07/13/2011)
  13. S.Amdt.551   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 07/13/2011)
  14. H.Amdt.414   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description Amendment prohibits the use of funds in contravention of the War Powers Resolution.
    Sponsor: Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] (Offered 06/13/2011)
    Latest Action: 06/13/11 On agreeing to the Sherman amendment (A006) Agreed to by recorded vote: 248 - 163 (Roll no. 415).
  15. H.Amdt.412   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description Amendment prohibits the use of funds in the bill to declare as excess to the needs of the Department of Veterans Affairs or otherwise take any action to exchange, trade, auction, transfer, or otherwise dispose of, or reduce the acreage of, Federal land and improvements at the St. Albans VA campus in New York.
    Sponsor: Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] (Offered 06/13/2011)
    Latest Action: 06/13/11 On agreeing to the Meeks amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote.