Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/14/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/20/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/20/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/20/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/20/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/20/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/20/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/21/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/21/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/22/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/22/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/23/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/23/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 09/26/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/26/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/26/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 10/03/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/03/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/03/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 10/03/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/04/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/04/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 10/04/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/05/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/06/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/06/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/06/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/06/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 10/06/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/11/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/11/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/11/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/11/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/13/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 10/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/14/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 10/14/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/25/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/02/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/02/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/02/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/14/2011