Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/20/2011 Became Public Law No: 112-73.
12/20/2011 Signed by President.
12/13/2011 Presented to President.
12/08/2011 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/08/2011 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8466)
11/02/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 818).(text: CR H7223)
07/18/2011 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 112-149.
05/31/2011 Introduced in House