There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 45 Meetinghouse Lane in Sagamore Beach, Massachusetts, as the "Matthew A. Pucino Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
11/07/2011Became Public Law No: 112-49. (TXT | PDF)
11/07/2011Signed by President.
10/31/2011Presented to President.
10/20/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6812)
10/19/2011Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
07/30/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 7/28/2011 H5727)
05/31/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/07/2011Became Public Law No: 112-49. (TXT | PDF)
11/07/2011Signed by President.
10/31/2011HousePresented to President.
10/20/2011SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/20/2011SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6812)
10/19/2011SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 209.
10/19/2011SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
10/19/2011SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
08/18/2011SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
08/01/2011SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/30/2011-3:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 7/28/2011 H5727)
07/30/2011-3:14pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5811)
07/28/2011-6:37pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lankford objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
07/28/2011-6:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2062.
07/28/2011-6:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5727-5728)
07/28/2011-6:32pmHouseMr. Lankford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/22/2011HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/22/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/22/2011HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/31/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
05/31/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform05/31/2011 Referred to
06/22/2011 Hearings by
06/22/2011 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs08/01/2011 Referred to
10/19/2011 Markup by
10/19/2011 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security08/18/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2062.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2062. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-49 (11/08/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 45 Meetinghouse Lane in Sagamore Beach, Massachusetts, as the "Matthew A. Pucino Post Office."